Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB793 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Miles S.B. No. 793
 (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2017; February 22, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; May 3, 2017, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 2; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 793 By:  Miles


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictions on the location and operation of concrete
 crushing facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 382.065, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections
 (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission by rule shall prohibit the operation of a
 concrete crushing facility within 440 yards of the following types
 of buildings or facilities:
 (1) a building in use as a single or multifamily
 residence, school, or place of worship;
 (2)  an area designated as a public park by action of a
 governmental entity; or
 (3)  after notice is given to the operator of the
 concrete crushing facility, an outdoor recreational facility used
 for organized sporting events during the time the recreational
 facility is used for those events [at the time the application for a
 permit to operate the facility at a site near the residence, school,
 or place of worship is filed with the commission].
 (a-1)  Rules adopted under this section must provide for the
 manner and time of giving notice to an operator of a concrete
 crushing facility under Subsection (a)(3).
 (a-2) The measurement of distance for purposes of this
 section is the shortest distance between [subsection shall be taken
 from the point on] the concrete crushing facility and a building,
 public park, or outdoor recreational facility described by
 Subsection (a) [that is nearest to the residence, school, or place
 of worship toward the point on the residence, school, or place of
 worship that is nearest the concrete crushing facility].
 (b)  A rule adopted under this section [Subsection (a)] does
 not apply to a concrete crushing facility:
 (1)  at a location for which commission authorization
 for the operation of a concrete crushing facility was in effect on
 September 1, 2001;
 (2)  at a location that satisfies the distance
 requirements of Subsection (a) at the time the application for the
 initial authorization for the operation of that facility at that
 location is filed with the commission, provided that the
 authorization is granted and maintained, regardless of whether a
 building, public park, or outdoor recreational facility described
 by Subsection (a) [single or multifamily residence, school, or
 place of worship] is subsequently built or put to use within 440
 yards of the facility; or
 (3)  that:
 (A)  uses a concrete crusher:
 (i)  in the manufacture of products that
 contain recycled materials; and
 (ii)  that is located in an enclosed
 building; and
 (B)  is located:
 (i)  within 25 miles of an international
 border; and
 (ii)  in a municipality with a population of
 not less than 6,100 but not more than 20,000.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for a permit to operate a concrete crushing
 facility that is filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An application for a permit filed before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect on the date of filing, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *