E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5752
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1979
|
Journal Page: 5752
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5747
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4134
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3907
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5563
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5563
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3568
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3568
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3568
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3568
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3567
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4610
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1726
|
Journal Page: 4609
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4609
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4609
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4479
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1675
|
Journal Page: 4479
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4479
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Allen and Bernal
|
Journal Page: 4477
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4477
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3572
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2644
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Garcia
|
Journal Page: 1652
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1652
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1652
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1534
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 682
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 484
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 437
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 325
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 325
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|