LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB801
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB801
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB801
Compare Versions
SB801 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB801 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB801 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB801 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
SB801 Engrossed May 4, 2017
SB801 Comm Sub May 1, 2017
SB801 Introduced February 9, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB801 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB801 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB801 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB801 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
SB801 Engrossed May 4, 2017
SB801 Comm Sub May 1, 2017
SB801 Introduced February 9, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare