E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3147
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1814
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4785
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
2-S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4785
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4785
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2297
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1638
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1260
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 325
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 325
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|