LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB805
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB805
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB805
Compare Versions
SB805 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB805 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB805 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB805 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
SB805 Engrossed May 2, 2017
SB805 Comm Sub April 24, 2017
SB805 Introduced February 9, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB805 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB805 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB805 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB805 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
SB805 Engrossed May 2, 2017
SB805 Comm Sub April 24, 2017
SB805 Introduced February 9, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare