E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5681
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3720
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3720
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3720
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3709
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1750
|
Journal Page: 4638
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4638
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4638
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4539
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1700
|
Journal Page: 4539
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
2-Ashby
|
Journal Page: 4539
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4538
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4527
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3529
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3384
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3384
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1321
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1283
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 1282
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1282
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1282
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1146
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 326
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 326
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|