LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB810
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB810
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB810
Compare Versions
SB810 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB810 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB810 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB810 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
SB810 Engrossed April 25, 2017
SB810 Comm Sub April 18, 2017
SB810 Introduced February 10, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB810 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB810 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB810 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB810 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
SB810 Engrossed April 25, 2017
SB810 Comm Sub April 18, 2017
SB810 Introduced February 10, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare