Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB825 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 10, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 16, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill May 26, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017