House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 3455 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3455 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3387 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1916 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1834 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1834 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1834 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1834 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1834 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1834 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1834 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1534 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |