Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB837 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2017

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 837
 (In the Senate - Filed February 13, 2017; February 27, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 1, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 1, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 837 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for student elections to authorize or
 increase certain fees at public institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 54, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 54.5001 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.5001.  PARTICIPATION REQUIREMENTS FOR STUDENT FEE
 ELECTIONS.  Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter
 or other law, a general student election held at a general academic
 teaching institution under this subchapter for the purpose of
 authorizing a student fee or approving an increase in the amount of
 an existing student fee is not valid unless:
 (1)  at least 10 percent of the students enrolled at the
 institution to whom the fee, or the increased amount of the fee,
 would apply if currently in effect participate in the election; and
 (2)  at least 30 percent of the students participating
 in the election are students enrolled in lower-division courses at
 the institution.
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.5001, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to an election held to authorize the
 imposition of a fee or fee increase on or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *