E | 05/29/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4243 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3141 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4804 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2963 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3141 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2622 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4410 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Record vote | RV#1634 | Journal Page: 4409 |
House | 05/23/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4409 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4409 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1087 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 338 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 338 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |