E | 05/29/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4243 | |
E | 05/23/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2881 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4565 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/21/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2248 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | RV#1358 | Journal Page: 3787 |
House | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3787 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3787 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3769 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3769 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3492 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3234 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 776 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 339 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 339 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |