Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB867 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 867
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2017;
 February 27, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; March 13, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 13, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of United States Highway 287 in
 Armstrong and Donley Counties as the Colonel Charles Goodnight
 Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  COLONEL CHARLES GOODNIGHT MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY.  (a)  The portion of United States Highway 287 from the
 eastern corporate limits of Claude to Clarendon in Armstrong and
 Donley Counties is designated as the Colonel Charles Goodnight
 Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Colonel Charles Goodnight Memorial Highway and
 any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *