Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB87 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hall S.B. No. 87
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2016; January 24, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; March 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to registration of a motor vehicle alleged to have been
 involved in a violation detected by a photographic traffic signal
 enforcement system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 707.017, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 707.017.  REGISTRATION AFTER CIVIL PENALTY IMPOSED
 [ENFORCEMENT].  The [(a)     If the owner of a motor vehicle is
 delinquent in the payment of a civil penalty imposed under this
 chapter, the] county assessor-collector or the Texas Department of
 Motor Vehicles may not refuse to register a motor vehicle alleged to
 have been involved in a [the] violation of this chapter solely
 because the owner of the motor vehicle is delinquent in the payment
 of a civil penalty imposed under this chapter.
 [(b)     This section does not apply to the registration of a
 motor vehicle under Section 501.0234.]
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *