House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1156 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1156 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1156 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1156 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1156 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1156 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1156 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |