2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2017; February 28, 2017, |
---|
3 | | - | read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; |
---|
4 | | - | April 10, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | | - | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 10, 2017, |
---|
6 | | - | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | | - | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 878 By: Hancock |
---|
9 | 2 | | |
---|
10 | 3 | | |
---|
11 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 6 | | relating to named driver policy disclosure requirements. |
---|
14 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 1952.0545, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
16 | 9 | | amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as |
---|
17 | 10 | | follows: |
---|
18 | 11 | | (b) Before accepting any premium or fee for a named driver |
---|
19 | 12 | | policy, an agent or insurer, including a county mutual insurance |
---|
20 | 13 | | company, must make the following disclosure, [orally and] in |
---|
21 | 14 | | writing, to the applicant or insured: |
---|
22 | 15 | | WARNING: A NAMED DRIVER POLICY DOES NOT PROVIDE COVERAGE FOR |
---|
23 | 16 | | INDIVIDUALS RESIDING IN THE INSURED'S HOUSEHOLD THAT ARE NOT |
---|
24 | 17 | | NAMED ON THE POLICY. |
---|
25 | 18 | | (c-1) A signature required by this section must be an |
---|
26 | 19 | | original signature or an electronic signature that complies with |
---|
27 | 20 | | Chapter 322, Business & Commerce Code, and Chapter 35 of this code. |
---|
28 | 21 | | SECTION 2. Section 1952.0545(e), Insurance Code, is |
---|
29 | 22 | | repealed. |
---|
30 | 23 | | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
31 | 24 | | to an insurance policy that is delivered, issued for delivery, or |
---|
32 | 25 | | renewed on or after January 1, 2018. A policy delivered, issued for |
---|
33 | 26 | | delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2018, is governed by the law |
---|
34 | 27 | | as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and |
---|
35 | 28 | | that law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
36 | 29 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|