Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB878 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/10/2017

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 878
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2017; February 28, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 10, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 10, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 878 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to named driver policy disclosure requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1952.0545, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Before accepting any premium or fee for a named driver
 policy, an agent or insurer, including a county mutual insurance
 company, must make the following disclosure, [orally and] in
 writing, to the applicant or insured:
 WARNING:  A NAMED DRIVER POLICY DOES NOT PROVIDE COVERAGE FOR
 INDIVIDUALS RESIDING IN THE INSURED'S HOUSEHOLD THAT ARE NOT
 NAMED ON THE POLICY.
 (c-1)  A signature required by this section must be an
 original signature or an electronic signature that complies with
 Chapter 322, Business & Commerce Code, and Chapter 35 of this code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1952.0545(e), Insurance Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an insurance policy that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
 renewed on or after January 1, 2018. A policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2018, is governed by the law
 as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *