House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2754 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2754 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Menndez | Journal Page: 758 |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 98 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 98 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |