House | 05/17/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 3655 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3655 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 358 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 358 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |