House | 05/15/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3147 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3147 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2458 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1688 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Uresti | Journal Page: 1582 |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1582 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1582 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1532 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 359 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 359 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |