Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB900 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/27/2017

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 900
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2017; February 28, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 27, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 27, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 900 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to enhanced penalties for certain family violence
 offenses; imposing court costs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 12, Penal Code, is amended
 by adding Section 12.475 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.475.  PENALTY FOR REPEAT FAMILY VIOLENCE OFFENDERS.
 (a)  This section applies only to an offense that is:
 (1)  a Class A misdemeanor or any higher category of
 offense; and
 (2)  committed under:
 (A)  Title 5, if an affirmative finding under
 Article 42.013, Code of Criminal Procedure, is made in the trial of
 the offense; or
 (B)  Section 25.11.
 (b)  An offense described by Subsection (a) is a felony of
 the second degree if it is shown on the trial of the offense that the
 actor has been previously convicted two or more times of any offense
 described by that subsection.  This subsection does not apply to an
 offense that is a felony of the first degree or a capital felony.
 (c)  For the purposes of this section, a defendant has been
 previously convicted of an offense described by Subsection (a) if
 the defendant was adjudged guilty of the offense or entered a plea
 of guilty or nolo contendere in return for a grant of deferred
 adjudication community supervision, regardless of whether the
 sentence for the offense was ever imposed or whether the sentence
 was probated and the defendant was subsequently discharged from
 community supervision.
 (d)  A previous conviction for an offense described by
 Subsection (a) may be used for purposes of enhancement under this
 section or enhancement under another provision of this subchapter,
 but not under both this section and the other provision of this
 subchapter.
 (e)  If the punishment scheme for an offense described by
 Subsection (a) contains a specific enhancement provision
 increasing punishment to a felony of the first degree for a
 defendant who has previously been convicted of the offense, the
 specific enhancement provision controls over this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 22.01, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-2)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), unless an exception
 is otherwise provided by that subsection, an offense under
 Subsection (a)(1) is a Class A misdemeanor with a minimum term of
 confinement of 30 days if:
 (1)  the offense is committed against a person whose
 relationship to or association with the defendant is described by
 Section 71.0021(b), 71.003, or 71.005, Family Code;
 (2)  the offense is committed in the physical presence
 or within the hearing of a person who is younger than 15 years of
 age; and
 (3)  at the time of the offense, the person has
 knowledge or reason to know that the person who is younger than 15
 years of age is present and may see or hear the offense.
 SECTION 3.  Article 42A.504, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  If a defendant is convicted of and placed on community
 supervision for, or placed on deferred adjudication community
 supervision for, an offense punished under Section 12.475, Penal
 Code, the judge shall require as a condition of community
 supervision that the defendant submit to a term of confinement of
 not less than 90 days.
 (f)  If a defendant is convicted of and placed on community
 supervision for, or placed on deferred adjudication community
 supervision for, an offense under Section 22.01, Penal Code, and
 punished under Subsection (b-2) of that section, the judge shall
 require as a condition of community supervision that the defendant
 submit to not less than five days of continuous confinement in
 county jail.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter A, Chapter 102, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Article 102.0188 to read as
 follows:
 Art. 102.0188.  ADDITIONAL COSTS ATTENDANT TO CERTAIN FAMILY
 VIOLENCE CONVICTIONS. (a)  A defendant shall pay $500 on
 conviction of an offense punished under Section 12.475, Penal Code.
 (b)  Costs imposed under this article are imposed without
 regard to whether the defendant is placed on community supervision
 after being convicted of the offense or is placed on deferred
 adjudication community supervision for the offense.
 (c)  The clerks of the respective courts shall collect the
 costs and pay them to the county treasurer, or to any other official
 who discharges the duties commonly delegated to the county
 treasurer, for deposit in a fund to be known as the family violence
 prevention fund.  A fund designated by this subsection may be used
 only to fund family violence prevention programs, battering
 intervention and prevention programs, family violence centers, and
 other resources for victims of family violence in the county where
 the court is located.
 (d)  The county family violence prevention fund shall be
 administered by or under the direction of the commissioners court.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter B, Chapter 102, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 102.0216 to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.0216.  ADDITIONAL COURT COSTS:  CODE OF CRIMINAL
 PROCEDURE. A defendant convicted of an offense punished under
 Section 12.475, Penal Code, shall pay a cost on conviction, in
 addition to all other costs, to fund resources for victims of family
 violence (Art. 102.0188, Code of Criminal Procedure) . . . $500.
 SECTION 6.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect only if a specific
 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *