House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1841 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1247 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1247 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1247 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1247 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1247 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1247 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Schwertner | Journal Page: 1246 |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1246 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1245 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1245 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1146 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1143 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 360 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 360 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 341 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 327 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |