Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB907 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Birdwell, et al. S.B. No. 907
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2017; February 28, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 18, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 April 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 907 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of the least restrictive environment for
 the placement of children in foster care.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 263.001(a), Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (3-a) and adding Subdivision (3-b) to read as
 follows:
 (3-a)  "Least restrictive setting" means a placement
 for a child that, in comparison to all other available placements,
 is the most family-like setting.
 (3-b)  "Physician assistant" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 157.051, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 263.001, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  With respect to a child who is removed from the child's
 home, if a suitable relative or other designated caregiver is not
 available, placing the child in a foster home or a general
 residential operation operating as a cottage home is considered the
 least restrictive setting.
 SECTION 3.  Section 264.001, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (3-a) to read as follows:
 (3-a)  "Least restrictive setting" means a placement
 for a child that, in comparison to all other available placements,
 is the most family-like setting.
 SECTION 4.  Section 264.107, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  In selecting a placement for a child, the department
 shall consider whether the placement is in the child's best
 interest.  In determining whether a placement is in a child's best
 interest, the department shall consider whether the placement:
 (1)  is the least restrictive setting for the child;
 (2)  is the closest in geographic proximity to the
 child's home;
 (3)  is the most able to meet the identified needs of
 the child; and
 (4)  satisfies any expressed interests of the child
 relating to placement, when developmentally appropriate.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect only if a specific
 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *