E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5566
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3317
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1751
|
Journal Page: 4638
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4638
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4638
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4539
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4539
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3451
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 361
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 361
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|