E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5566
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3425
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3425
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3425
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3425
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3907
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1426
|
Journal Page: 3906
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3906
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3906
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3857
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3857
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Romero
|
Journal Page: 3857
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3857
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1516
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1516
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1516
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1515
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1515
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1515
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1515
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1146
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 361
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 361
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|