LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB922
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB922
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB922
Compare Versions
SB922 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB922 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB922 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB922 Comm Sub May 15, 2017
SB922 Engrossed May 1, 2017
SB922 Comm Sub April 18, 2017
SB922 Introduced February 16, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB922 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB922 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB922 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB922 Comm Sub May 15, 2017
SB922 Engrossed May 1, 2017
SB922 Comm Sub April 18, 2017
SB922 Introduced February 16, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare