House | 05/22/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4575 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security | Journal Page: 98 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 98 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |