Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB94 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hall S.B. No. 94
22 (Wilson)
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to a ribbon for certain members of the military forces who
88 served in support of operations to secure the Texas border.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Section 437.355(a), Government Code, as amended
1111 by Chapters 144 (H.B. 115) and 760 (H.B. 2108), Acts of the 84th
1212 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted and amended to
1313 read as follows:
1414 (a) The governor or adjutant general, if delegated the
1515 authority, may adopt policies and regulations relating to awarding:
1616 (1) the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be
1717 awarded to a service member who:
1818 (A) after September 11, 2001:
1919 (i) was inducted into federal service from
2020 the Texas National Guard; and
2121 (ii) meets the criteria for an award of the
2222 federal Purple Heart Medal; or
2323 (B) was wounded or killed at Fort Hood on
2424 November 5, 2009;
2525 (2) the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
2626 awarded to:
2727 (A) a service member of the Texas military forces
2828 who has:
2929 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
3030 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
3131 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
3232 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
3333 demanding responsibility; or
3434 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
3535 service to the Texas military forces;
3636 (3) the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which
3737 shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state,
3838 another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding
3939 achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of
4040 great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces
4141 for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for
4242 award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that:
4343 (A) gives an account of the exceptional
4444 achievement or service; and
4545 (B) includes facts and photographs, and extracts
4646 from official documents to support and amplify the facts;
4747 (4) the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall
4848 be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state,
4949 another state, or the United States who has performed service in a
5050 superior and clearly outstanding manner;
5151 (5) the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall
5252 be awarded to a service member who:
5353 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
5454 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
5555 (B) is a member of the Texas military forces; and
5656 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
5757 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United
5858 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
5959 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
6060 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
6161 (6) the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which
6262 shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces
6363 who served:
6464 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
6565 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
6666 state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code;
6767 and
6868 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
6969 mission in the state under civilian authority;
7070 (7) the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded
7171 to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the
7272 Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or
7373 after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
7474 (8) the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
7575 awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served,
7676 after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by
7777 the United States secretary of defense;
7878 (9) the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
7979 awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed
8080 five years of honorable service during which the service member has
8181 shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
8282 this state;
8383 (10) the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded
8484 to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or
8585 the United States who performs outstanding service or attains
8686 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
8787 (11) the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall
8888 be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive
8989 years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the
9090 service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and
9191 great loyalty to this state;
9292 (12) the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign
9393 Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted
9494 into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1,
9595 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert
9696 Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was
9797 deployed while serving on active federal military duty;
9898 (13) the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
9999 awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
100100 from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the
101101 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
102102 military duty, after:
103103 (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
104104 Freedom; or
105105 (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
106106 Dawn;
107107 (14) the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall
108108 be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
109109 from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of
110110 Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the
111111 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
112112 military duty; [and]
113113 (15) the Cold War Medal, which, subject to Subsection
114114 (c), shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this
115115 state or the United States who:
116116 (A) served between September 2, 1945, and
117117 December 26, 1991; and
118118 (B) was a resident of this state at the time the
119119 service member entered military service; and
120120 (16) the Texas Border Security and Support Service
121121 Ribbon, which shall be awarded to a member of the state military
122122 forces who served:
123123 (A) on or after July 28, 2014;
124124 (B) on state active duty for at least 30
125125 consecutive days; and
126126 (C) satisfactorily in support of operations to
127127 secure the Texas border.
128128 SECTION 2. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
129129 over another Act of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017,
130130 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
131131 codes.
132132 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.