E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5566
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3407
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3407
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3407
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3406
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3901
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1419
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3849
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Leach
|
Journal Page: 3848
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3848
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3391
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1447
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 948
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 948
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 956
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 931
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 393
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 393
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|