LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB969
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB969
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB969
Compare Versions
SB969 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB969 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB969 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB969 Comm Sub May 11, 2017
SB969 Engrossed April 10, 2017
SB969 Comm Sub March 29, 2017
SB969 Introduced February 21, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB969 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB969 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB969 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB969 Comm Sub May 11, 2017
SB969 Engrossed April 10, 2017
SB969 Comm Sub March 29, 2017
SB969 Introduced February 21, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare