E | 05/29/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4243 | |
E | 05/23/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2881 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4565 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/21/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2254 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4030 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Record vote | RV#1481 | Journal Page: 4029 |
House | 05/21/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4029 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4029 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3930 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Record vote | RV#1441 | Journal Page: 3930 |
House | 05/20/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3930 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3930 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3606 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 3150 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3150 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Schwertner | Journal Page: 1033 |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1143 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 405 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 405 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |