House | 05/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3572 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1046 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1046 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1046 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1046 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1046 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amendment adopted as amended | FA1 Taylor of Collin | Journal Page: 1046 |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1046 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amendment amended | Journal Page: 1046 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amendment to amendment offered | FA2 Schwertner | Journal Page: 1045 |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 1045 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Schwertner | Journal Page: 1034 |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1143 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 406 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 406 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |