Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB979 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Schwertner S.B. No. 979
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2017; March 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 6, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 6, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 979 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disposition of real property intended for
 high-speed rail projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 112, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 112.063 to read as follows:
 Sec. 112.063.  DISPOSITION OF REAL PROPERTY ACQUIRED FOR
 HIGH-SPEED RAIL PROJECT. (a)  In this section, "high-speed rail"
 means intercity passenger service that is reasonably expected to
 reach speeds of at least 110 miles per hour.
 (b)  A private entity that operates or plans to operate a
 high-speed rail project and acquires real property for a high-speed
 rail project through the threat of the exercise of a purported power
 of eminent domain:
 (1)  may not use the property for any purpose other than
 a high-speed rail project; and
 (2)  if the property is not used for a high-speed rail
 project, may not convey the property to any person unless the former
 property owner is given notice and opportunity to repurchase the
 property.
 (c)  This section applies to a private entity that represents
 itself:
 (1)  as a railroad, whether or not the entity is a
 railroad; or
 (2)  as another entity that may exercise the power of
 eminent domain.
 SECTION 2.  Section 112.063, Transportation Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to real property acquired on or after
 September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *