Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB980 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Schwertner S.B. No. 980
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2017; March 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 10, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 10, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 980 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to state money or credit or a state guarantee used or
 provided for high-speed rail owned by a private entity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 199, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Section 199.003 to read as follows:
 Sec. 199.003.  STATE MONEY FOR HIGH-SPEED RAIL; PRIORITY OF
 LIEN.  (a)  For the purposes of this section, "high-speed rail"
 means intercity passenger rail service that is reasonably expected
 to reach speeds that exceed 110 miles per hour.
 (b)  No state money, credit, or guarantee shall be used or
 provided, wholly or partly, for any purpose related to high-speed
 rail owned by a private entity unless, to secure the repayment of
 state money, this state acquires and maintains a lien on or other
 security interest in:
 (1)  property of the private entity acquired with or
 through state money or credit or using a guarantee of this state; or
 (2)  other assets owned by the private entity.
 (c)  Before an entity or official of this state enters into
 an agreement to provide state money or credit or a state guarantee
 under Subsection (b), the Bond Review Board must review and certify
 the agreement to ensure that the lien or other security interest
 described by that subsection is sufficient, in accordance with
 generally accepted accounting standards, to protect this state's
 financial interests.
 (d)  A lien on or other security interest held by this state
 in property or other assets described by Subsection (b) is superior
 and prior to any other lien, claim, or interest of any other person
 on or against the property or other assets of the private entity.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *