Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB981 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 981
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2017; March 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 6, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 1; April 6, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the compatibility of a high-speed rail facility with
 multiple types of train technology.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 112, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 112.063 to read as follows:
 Sec. 112.063.  HIGH-SPEED RAIL TECHNOLOGIES.  (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "High-speed rail" means intercity passenger
 service that is reasonably expected to reach speeds of at least 110
 miles per hour.
 (2)  "Rail facility" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 91.001.
 (b)  A private entity that constructs a rail facility for
 high-speed rail service shall ensure that the facility is
 compatible with more than one type of train technology.
 (c)  The department shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *