Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR10

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 25, 2017, and ending on Monday, January 30, 2017.

Impact

The passage of SCR10 is significant in that it underscores the procedural requirements set forth in the Texas Constitution regarding legislative adjournments. By adhering to this constitutional framework, the resolution helps maintain a structured legislative process. The implication of this resolution means that the legislature can reconvene after an extended break if the majority in both the House and Senate agree to it, thereby facilitating a more flexible session without interrupting critical legislative work.

Summary

SCR10 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution that grants permission for the Texas Legislature to adjourn for more than three days during a specific period. The resolution outlines the dates for this extended adjournment, which is from January 25, 2017, to January 30, 2017. The purpose of such resolutions typically revolves around logistical planning to allow the legislature to manage its time effectively during the session. SCR10 reflects standard legislative procedure that requires mutual consent for extended adjournments as stipulated in the Texas Constitution.

Sentiment

The general sentiment surrounding SCR10 was overwhelmingly supportive, as indicated by the votes in both chambers of the legislature. The resolution was adopted in the Senate with a vote of 31 in favor and no opposition. Similarly, the House passed it with a vote of 142 in favor, against only 1 opposing vote. This strong majority reflects a consensus among legislators regarding the necessity of procedural flexibility within the framework of their responsibilities.

Contention

There were minimal points of contention regarding SCR10, as this type of resolution is often viewed as a routine matter within the legislature. Disagreements may arise in other contexts concerning the timing and frequency of adjournments, but in this instance, the resolution received near-universal approval. The legislative discussion focused primarily on ensuring proper adherence to constitutional mandates rather than addressing any substantive disagreements over policy or ideology.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.