E | 05/30/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 4243 | |
House | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6059 | |
Senate | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4237 | |
Senate | 05/28/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4243 | |
Senate | 05/28/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 4158 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#2032 | Journal Page: 5954 |
House | 05/28/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5954 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 5954 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4575 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3902 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 3151 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1710 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 932 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 174 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 174 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |