Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR11 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill January 24, 2017

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill May 29, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017