Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR12

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 1, 2017, and ending on Monday, February 6, 2017.

Impact

The adoption of SCR12 preserves the procedural integrity of the Texas legislative process while allowing flexibility in the scheduling of sessions. By permitting extended adjournment, the measure aims to accommodate the legislative needs of the houses, facilitating necessary discussions and considerations that might otherwise be constrained by a stricter schedule. This flexibility can ultimately lead to more thorough deliberations on legislative matters before the houses.

Summary

SCR12 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution from the 85th Legislature of Texas, which seeks to grant permission for both houses of the legislature to adjourn for more than three days during the specific period from February 1, 2017, to February 6, 2017. The Texas Constitution restricts either house from adjourning for extended periods without the consent of the other house. Therefore, this resolution is intended to provide the necessary legislative consent to facilitate a longer recess during this time frame.

Sentiment

Overall, the sentiment surrounding SCR12 was positive, reflecting a consensus among legislators. The key point of agreement is the necessity for legislative bodies to have the ability to adapt their meeting schedules according to the demands of legislative work. Both the Senate and the House demonstrated unanimous support, indicating a collaborative approach to the resolution of procedural matters and a focus on legislative efficacy.

Contention

There were minimal points of contention associated with SCR12, primarily because it did not propose significant policy changes or contentious issues. The primary focus was procedural rather than substantive, which generally yields broad agreement. However, discussions around legislative adjournments can occasionally spark debates regarding the importance of efficiency and the effective management of legislative time, reflecting deeper issues about legislative priorities and accountability.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.