E | 02/15/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 294 | |
House | 02/15/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 274 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 281 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 260 | |
House | 02/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#32 | Journal Page: 262 |
House | 02/09/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 262 | |
House | 02/09/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 261 | |
House | 02/07/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 245 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 180 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 180 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read | Journal Page: 180 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 179 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |