Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR15

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 8, 2017, and ending on Monday, February 13, 2017.

Impact

The passage of SCR15 is expected to motivate legislative committees to review and potentially amend existing laws that pertain to state governance and educational policies. This could result in significant shifts in how education is managed at the state level, opening the door for new initiatives and reforms that focus on better resource allocation and management. Additionally, it underscores the legislative intent to work collaboratively to address pressing issues within the state, particularly as they pertain to education and community needs.

Summary

SCR15 is a concurrent resolution that aims to address certain aspects of state governance and education policy reform, emphasizing the need for legislative clarity and consistency across various state laws. This resolution is designed to facilitate discussions on enhancing the educational framework and ensuring that state policies remain aligned with the evolving needs of the population. Supporters believe that by revisiting and re-evaluating existing policies, this resolution can lead to improved educational outcomes and better governance at the state level.

Sentiment

General sentiment around SCR15 appears to be cautiously optimistic. Proponents are encouraged by the potential for reform and the promise of a more streamlined approach to addressing educational policies. However, there are concerns among some lawmakers about the practicalities of implementing such reforms and the potential for unintended consequences if changes are made too hastily. This ambivalence reveals a recognition of both the necessity for reform and the complexities involved in making effective changes.

Contention

Notable points of contention surrounding SCR15 include debates on the prioritization of educational needs versus budgetary constraints faced by the state. Some legislators argue that while reform is essential, it must be done in a manner that does not compromise existing resources for education. Additionally, there are discussions about the methods proposed for evaluating policies and whether they adequately address the varied needs of different communities throughout the state.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.