E | 02/23/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 343 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 461 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 319 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 296 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Record vote | RV#38 | Journal Page: 359 |
House | 02/20/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 359 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 359 | |
House | 02/15/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Read | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |