Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 15, 2017, and ending on Tuesday, February 21, 2017.

Impact

The adoption of SCR20 allows the Texas Legislature to manage its session more effectively. Given the considerable number of bills and issues handled during legislative sessions, this resolution enables lawmakers to take short breaks that may be critical for deliberation and strategy. As the legislative process can be intense and time-consuming, extending the period for adjournment can potentially enhance the overall efficiency of legislative work and allow for better preparation for subsequent sessions.

Summary

SCR20 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution that proposes to grant permission for the Texas Legislature to adjourn for more than three days during a specific period, from February 15, 2017, to February 21, 2017. This resolution specifically addresses the requirement set forth in Section 17, Article III of the Texas Constitution, which generally prohibits either house of the legislature from adjourning beyond three days without mutual consent. By passing this resolution, the legislature acknowledges and facilitates a longer recess which can be necessary for operational flexibility.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR20 appears to be largely neutral, as the resolution primarily serves a procedural purpose rather than a controversial legislative goal. Both houses of the Texas Legislature unanimously adopted the resolution with no recorded opposition, indicating a general consensus on the need for operational flexibility. Such procedural resolutions often reflect the necessity for legislative bodies to adapt to dynamic circumstances while working to fulfill their legislative duties.

Contention

While SCR20 did not engender significant contention, it does highlight the importance of procedural rules within legislative practice. Some may argue that frequent adjournments can lead to inefficiencies, while others might contend that they are essential for thorough legislative review and citizen engagement. Nonetheless, the swift adoption of the resolution with 30-0 votes in the Senate and 139-0 votes in the House suggests that lawmakers are in agreement regarding the need for legislative bodies to occasionally extend their adjournment periods to better serve their processes.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.