Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/22/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.C.R. No. 20


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Section 17, Article III, Texas Constitution,
 provides that neither house of the legislature may adjourn for more
 than three days without the consent of the other house; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas, That
 each house grant the other permission to adjourn for more than three
 days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 15, 2017,
 and ending on Tuesday, February 21, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 20 was adopted by the Senate
 on February 14, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 20 was adopted by the House
 on February 20, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 0,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House