E | 03/01/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 396 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 350 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 364 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 330 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Record vote | RV#42 | Journal Page: 438 |
House | 02/23/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 438 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 438 | |
House | 02/22/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 302 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 302 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Read | Journal Page: 302 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 302 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |