Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR23

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 22, 2017, and ending on Monday, February 27, 2017.

Impact

The passage of SCR23 does not change existing state law or create new regulations; instead, it allows the legislature to manage its session schedule more flexibly. By securing the necessary permissions to extend adjournment, the legislature can allocate time for necessary discussions, negotiations, or deliberations that may require a longer break than usual, thus enabling more thorough consideration of legislative matters.

Summary

SCR23 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution that was introduced during the 85th Legislature of Texas. This resolution grants permission for each house of the legislature to adjourn for more than three days during a specified period from February 22, 2017, to February 27, 2017. The provision is significant as it temporarily exempts the legislature from the constraints set forth in Section 17, Article III of the Texas Constitution, which typically prohibits adjournments exceeding three days without mutual consent.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR23 was supportive within the legislature, as demonstrated by the unanimous vote in favor of its adoption. The resolution was adopted by the Senate with 31 votes in favor and 0 against, and later by the House with a vote of 137 to 2. This broad support indicates a recognition among legislators of the need for adaptability within the session scheduling to accommodate various legislative agendas and priorities.

Contention

There was minimal contention regarding SCR23, given its procedural nature and the unanimous support it received. The resolution's simplicity and purpose were clear, focusing solely on adjournment permissions without delving into divisive policy issues. However, it does highlight the importance of procedural rules in legislative operations, reflecting how such resolutions can facilitate or hinder legislative efficiency depending on the circumstances surrounding a particular session.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.