E | 03/09/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 466 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 611 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 442 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 420 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#60 | Journal Page: 550 |
House | 03/06/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 03/02/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 388 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 388 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Read | Journal Page: 388 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 388 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |