Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR28

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 1, 2017, and ending on Monday, March 6, 2017.

Impact

The immediate impact of SCR28 on state laws is procedural, as it does not change any law but adjusts the operational capability of the legislature during the session. By allowing longer adjournments, the legislature can avoid unnecessary interruptions to their deliberations, thereby streamlining their processes. The resolution reflects a recognition of the complex nature of legislative work and the need for flexibility in handling legislative duties, particularly during tense periods when issues require deep contemplation or negotiation.

Summary

SCR28 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution from the Texas 85th Legislature that grants legislative permission for both the Senate and the House of Representatives to adjourn for more than three days within a specified period. Specifically, it allows each house to adjourn longer than the usual three-day limit set by Section 17, Article III of the Texas Constitution, during the timeframe from March 1, 2017, to March 6, 2017. This resolution was adopted by both legislative houses to manage their session timelines more flexibly, enabling them to plan effectively for the conduct of their business, especially when facing lengthy discussions or negotiations on pending legislation.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR28 was largely positive, as it was unanimously adopted by both chambers, with the Senate voting 31 in favor and the House 142 in favor without opposition. Such broad support highlights a collective understanding among lawmakers of the practical necessity for accommodating extended breaks in the legislative schedule. This suggests a collaborative spirit within the Texas legislature and indicates that members agree on the importance of effectively managing their time to facilitate thorough discussions and decision-making.

Contention

While SCR28 encountered no substantial opposition, it opens up a discussion about legislative efficiency and the balance of time management within governmental processes. Some critics of similar resolutions might argue that extended adjournments could lead to delays in critical legislation; however, this sentiment was not prominent during the discussions surrounding SCR28. Instead, the prevailing opinion leaned towards appreciating the measure's potential to enhance legislative productivity through better-managed session dynamics.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.