05/10/2017 | Signed by the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Again read | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
05/01/2017 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/01/2017 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | House passage reported | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |