Senate | 05/17/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 174 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 174 | |
Senate | 12/29/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/29/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |